U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.