U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00337
  • Case Name: Sams et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 10, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.