U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00113
  • Case Name: State of Mississippi et al v. Becerra et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.