U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Rush v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.