U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00759
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Packers Sanitation Services, Inc. LTD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.