U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Sartin et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.