U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Love, IV
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.