U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Barrett v. US Foods, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.