U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03154
  • Case Name: Bassett v. Gray Media Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.