U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00821
  • Case Name: Wallis v. American Economy Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.