U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00719
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Polk's Discount Drugs, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 07, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.