U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-02985
  • Case Name: KRP Construction, LLC v. Worldwide Trucks, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.