U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00073
  • Case Name: American General Life Insurance Company v. Pelkey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 14, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 06, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.