U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Miles v. City of Beaumont et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 02, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.