U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $16,519.00 United States Currency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 13, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 07, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 05, 2025: [Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.