U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00054
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $14,800.00 United States Currency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 15, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 14, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 14, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Service by Publication]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.