U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Jones v. TEW of Louisiana LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.