U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Saint Paul Commodities, Inc. v. Oleo-X, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Request Letter]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.