U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Gulf South Pipeline Company, LLC v. 0.53 Acres, More or Less, of Real Property Situated in the SE 1/4 of the SE 1/4 of Section 20, Township 5 North, Range 13 West, Forrest County Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 02, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.