U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Wogan et al v. City of Ridgeland, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.