U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Howard v. Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • May 13, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.