U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Goods v. State of Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Partial Payment of Filing Fee]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
  • April 15, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Opsp2]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proceed IFP 1983]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.