U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.