U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Thom v. West Physics Consulting, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 16, 2025: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.