U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Beach Lumber, LLC v. Turnkey Lumber, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit (Restricted) (Document)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Default Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.