U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.