U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Cuevas Machine Company, Inc. v. Calgon Carbon Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 18, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 12, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.