U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Vanlaningham v. Cain et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Directing Service By U.S. Marshal]
  • May 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 05, 2025: [Partial Payment of Filing Fee]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Directing Service By U.S. Marshal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
  • March 19, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.