U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Bender v. Contra Costa Criminal District Atty. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attachment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.