U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Ly Investments, LLC v. Pandit Law Firm, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.