U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevens, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.