U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LANGSTON, JR., et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.