U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.