U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 19, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.