U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAVEZ-RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.