U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00298
  • Case Name: Paz v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.