U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.