U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00676
  • Case Name: Taylor v. McDonough
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.