U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00691
  • Case Name: Malone v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.