U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Atlantic Oceanic LLC v. HF Offshore Services Mexico SAPI de CV et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 20, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Custodian]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.