U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00193
  • Case Name: McLin v. Jackson State University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 20, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.