U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Long v. Kerecis LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.