U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [USCA Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.