U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Terry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.