U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Boyd v. Mississippi Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 13, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 13, 2025: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Opsp2]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Proceed IFP 1983]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.