U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smiley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 21, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.