U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Tirado v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 24, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Attachment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.