U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Bordelon v. PHH Mortgage Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.