U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TYLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.