U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Stringer v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.